Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Paul Herzog

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1942Born
1 Jun 196826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Natchez-Jackson, Mississippi, USA
1 Mar 197734.8IncardinatedPriest of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
4 Nov 200462.5AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
5 Jan 200562.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
2 Feb 201774.7RetiredBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
12 Apr 201976.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Ronald Paul Herzog
Bishop Ronald Paul Herzog (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkron, OH
Ordained BishopSaint Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Alexandria, Diocese of Alexandria, Louisiana
Death PlaceAlexandria, Diocese of Alexandria, Louisiana

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,803
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017
  • d: CB, 12 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast