Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Matthew Hannan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1913BornWashington
8 Dec 193926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland, USA
16 Jun 195643.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
16 Jun 195643.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
28 Aug 195643.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
29 Sep 196552.4AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
13 Oct 196552.4InstalledArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
6 Dec 198875.5RetiredArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
29 Sep 201198.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Philip Matthew Hannan:
Archbishop Philip Matthew Hannan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans

  • a priest for 71.8 years
  • a bishop for 55.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 75
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014