Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Marafini

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1917BornCori
18 May 194022.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 196447.0AppointedBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
13 Dec 196447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
10 Aug 197355.7DiedBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Marafini:
Bishop Giuseppe Marafini (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013