Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Joseph Feeney

Deceased

Bishop of Portland, Maine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1894BornPortland
21 May 192126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Portland, Maine, USA
22 Jun 194651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
22 Jun 194651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
12 Sep 194652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
4 Mar 195257.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
8 Sep 195560.9SucceededBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
15 Sep 196975.0DiedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Feeney:
Bishop Daniel Joseph Feeney (born , died ) Bishop of Portland

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015