Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Lardone

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Rhizaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1887Born
29 Jun 191023.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 194962.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhizaeum
21 May 194962.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
21 May 194962.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
30 Jun 194962.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhizaeum
21 Nov 195366.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
30 Jun 195972.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
29 Feb 196073.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Turkey
1966²78.9RetiredApostolic Internuncio to Turkey
30 Jan 198093.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lardone (VIAF: 883069)
Archbishop Francesco Lardone (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Turkey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoretta, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 52
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 143, and Page 207, and Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast