Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joyce Russell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1897Born
8 Jul 192325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
28 Jan 195052.1AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
14 Mar 195052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
3 Jul 195860.5AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
30 Sep 195860.8InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
28 Apr 197375.4RetiredBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
17 Mar 199395.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joyce Russell
Bishop John Joyce Russell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast