Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Felici

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1919Born
4 Apr 194222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
22 Jul 196747.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesariana
22 Jul 196747.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands
24 Sep 196748.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesariana
13 May 197656.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
27 Aug 197960.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
28 Jun 198868.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
28 Jun 198868.9Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 198868.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
13 Jun 199575.8RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
16 Dec 199576.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
9 Jan 199979.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
13 Apr 200080.7RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
17 Jun 200787.8DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

MicroData Summary for Angelo Felici
Angelo Cardinal Felici (born , died ) President Emeritus of “Ecclesia Dei”

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegni, Italy

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast