Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Celestin Daly, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1894Born
12 Jun 192126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Mar 194853.3AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
13 May 194853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
23 Nov 196470.0DiedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Celestin Daly
Bishop Edward Celestin Daly O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambridge, MA

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast