Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bryan Joseph McEntegart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Archbishop of Gabii

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rector/Catholic University of America)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1893Born
8 Sep 191724.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 194350.4AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
3 Aug 194350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
19 Aug 195360.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
16 Apr 195764.2AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
13 Jun 195764.4InstalledBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Apr 196673.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Jul 196875.5RetiredBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Jul 196875.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabii
30 Sep 196875.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Bryan Joseph McEntegart
Archbishop Bryan Joseph McEntegart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast