Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Julius FitzSimon

Deceased

Bishop of Amarillo, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1895BornSan Antonio
17 May 192126.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
2 Aug 194146.5AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
22 Oct 194146.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
5 Nov 194146.8InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
2 Jul 195863.4DiedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Laurence Julius FitzSimon:
Bishop Laurence Julius FitzSimon (born , died ) Bishop of Amarillo

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013