Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph McCormick

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia

Titular Bishop of Atenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1880BornNorwich, CT
26 Jul 190423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
14 Jun 195069.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
14 Jun 195069.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Atenia
21 Sep 195069.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atenia
18 May 195372.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph McCormick:
Bishop Patrick Joseph McCormick (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013