Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zenone Albino Testa, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Asmara, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Tinista


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1914Born
7 Aug 193723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Jul 195945.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Asmara, Ethiopia
10 Jul 195945.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinista
9 Apr 196146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinista
12 Aug 196147.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Asmara, Ethiopia
12 Jun 197157.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Asmara, Ethiopia
19 Sep 198268.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Asmara, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Zenone Albino Testa
Bishop Zenone Albino Testa O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Asmara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVertova, Italy

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast