Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Alciati

Deceased

Bishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)

Prefect of the Congregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1522Born
5 Sep 156139.5AppointedBishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy
12 Mar 156543.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156543.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
3 Jun 156543.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
Sep 1565³43.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent
13 May 156947.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
20 Apr 158058.2DiedBishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alciati (VIAF: 9862508)
Francesco Cardinal Alciati (born , died ) Bishop of Civitate (CittÓ or Civita)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria degli Angeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 15.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1561, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Oct 2017