Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joël Michel Marie Luc Mercier

Secretary of the Congregation for the Clergy

Titular Archbishop of Rota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1945 Born
27 Jun 197025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
8 Jan 201570.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
8 Jan 201570.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rota
19 Mar 201570.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rota

MicroData Summary for Joël Michel Marie Luc Mercier
Archbishop Joël Michel Marie Luc Mercier (born ) Secretary of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaudefonds-sur-Layon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2015
  • fn: CB, 14 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 11 Feb 2015
  • c2: CB, 13 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 14 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast