Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Vittorio Amedeo Cardinal delle Lanze

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1712BornTurin, Italy
10 Apr 174734.6Elevated to Cardinal
31 Jul 174734.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
11 Aug 174734.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
24 Sep 174735.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
2 Oct 174735.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
22 Nov 175846.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
21 Mar 176350.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
12 Apr 177360.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
22 Mar 177562.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
18 Jul 178370.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
23 Jan 178471.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Carlo Vittorio Amedeo delle Lanze:
Carlo Vittorio Amedeo Cardinal delle Lanze (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747
  • c2+: CB
  • c34: CB, 2 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015