Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Casimiro Cardinal Gennari

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1839Born
19 Apr 186222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Conversano, Italy
21 Mar 186323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Conversano, Italy
13 May 188141.3AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
15 May 188141.3Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
6 Feb 189757.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
15 Apr 190161.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190161.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
20 Oct 190868.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
31 Jan 191474.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Gennari (VIAF: 71381609)
Casimiro Cardinal Gennari (born , died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaratea, Diocese of Policastro, Italy
Ordained PriestCosenza, Archdiocese of Cosenza, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Alfonso all'Esquilino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceApt at Palazzo Borghese, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Chapel, Cemetery, Maratea, Diocese of Policastro, Italy

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224, and Page 404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017