Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal d’Andrea

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1812BornNaples, Italy
4 Oct 183523.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 184129.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
18 Jul 184129.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Melitene
30 Jul 184129.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
30 Aug 184533.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
15 Mar 185239.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185239.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
4 Jul 185341.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
28 Sep 186048.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
31 Jul 186149.3ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
14 May 186856.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation of the Index

MicroData Summary for Girolamo d’Andrea:
Cardinal Girolamo d’Andrea (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Index

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 46
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013