Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Galeazzo Cardinal Marescotti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1627BornVignanello
29 Sep 166234.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 166840.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
4 Mar 166840.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
10 Mar 166840.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
13 Aug 167042.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
27 May 167547.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 167648.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
4 Sep 167951.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tivoli, Italy
22 Sep 168153.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
21 Nov 168457.1ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
10 May 169264.6AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
Dec 1695³68.1ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
21 Jun 170072.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
30 Apr 170880.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
3 Jul 172698.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galeazzo Marescotti:
Galeazzo Cardinal Marescotti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 58.3 years
  • a cardinal for 51.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015