Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero Cardinal Caterini

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1795Born
7 Mar 185357.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 185357.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
26 Sep 186064.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
18 Dec 187681.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
21 Dec 187681.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
28 Oct 188186.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Prospero Caterini
Prospero Cardinal Caterini (born , died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnano, Italy

  • a cardinal for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Mar 1853
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast