Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Celsi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600BornRome, Italy
166464.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
14 Jan 166464.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 166464.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
14 May 166868.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
6 Nov 167171.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Angelo Celsi:
Angelo Cardinal Celsi (died ) Prefect of Council

  • a cardinal for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015