Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Roberto Maria Redaelli

Archbishop of Gorizia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1956 Born
14 Jun 198023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 200447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Apr 200447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
5 Jun 200447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
28 Jun 201256.0AppointedArchbishop of Gorizia, Italy
14 Oct 201256.3InstalledArchbishop of Gorizia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Roberto Maria Redaelli
Archbishop Carlo Roberto Maria Redaelli (born ) Archbishop of Gorizia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gorizia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,607
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018