Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Bruno

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Prefect of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1875Born
10 Apr 189822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
14 Feb 192448.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
3 Jul 193055.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
18 Feb 194670.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194670.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
16 Nov 194974.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
20 Mar 195478.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Mar 195478.7AppointedPrefect of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
10 Nov 195479.3DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bruno
Giuseppe Cardinal Bruno (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSezzadio

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a cardinal for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast