Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco di Paola Cardinal Cassetta

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1841BornRoma
10 Jun 186523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
2 Dec 188443.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
21 Dec 188443.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
25 Nov 188746.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
29 Nov 189554.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
19 Jun 189957.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189957.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
28 Apr 190159.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
27 Mar 190563.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 Jun 191169.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
27 Nov 191170.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
3 Jan 191472.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
10 Feb 191472.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
23 Mar 191977.6DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Francesco di Paola Cassetta:
Francesco di Paola Cardinal Cassetta (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
  • a cardinal for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 413, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46, and Page 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014