Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clemente Cardinal Argenvillieres

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1687Born
26 Nov 175365.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175365.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
Dec 175769.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
23 Dec 175870.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio

MicroData Summary for Clemente Argenvillieres (VIAF: 89085784)
Clemente Cardinal Argenvillieres (born , died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast