Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Roberti

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1889BornPergola
3 Aug 191324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
9 Mar 194656.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
15 Dec 195869.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195869.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
14 Nov 195970.3AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
5 Apr 196272.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Columnata
19 Apr 196272.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Columnata
19 Apr 196272.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Columnata
26 Jun 196777.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
24 Mar 196979.7RetiredPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
16 Jul 197788.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Francesco Roberti:
Francesco Cardinal Roberti (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014