Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuele Cardinal de Gregorio

Deceased

Secretary of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Titular See: (Ecclesiastical Immunity)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1758Born(at sea)
8 Mar 181657.2Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181657.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
29 Nov 181859.9AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
6 May 182061.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
18 May 182970.4AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
18 May 182970.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
31 May 182970.4Ordained BishopBishop of Frascati, Italy
11 Dec 183475.9AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
2 Oct 183778.7AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
2 Oct 183778.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
7 Nov 183980.8DiedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele de Gregorio:
Emmanuele Cardinal de Gregorio (born , died ) Secretary of Roman Curia - Other

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015