Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Carlos Patrón Wong

Official of the Congregation for the Clergy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1958 Born
12 Jan 198830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
15 Oct 200951.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
15 Dec 200951.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
2 May 201254.3SucceededBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
21 Sep 201355.7AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Clergy
21 Sep 201355.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)

MicroData Summary for Jorge Carlos Patrón Wong
Archbishop Jorge Carlos Patrón Wong (born ) Official of Clergy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,330
  • s: Bollettino, 2 May 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast