Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Cennini de’ Salamandri

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1566BornSarteano
1591²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 161245.8AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
21 Oct 161245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
17 Jul 161851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
17 Dec 161852.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
Jan 1621³54.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
11 Jan 162154.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 162154.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
2 Oct 162356.8AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
25 Feb 164174.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Santa Sabina
4 May 164376.4ResignedBishop of Faenza, Italy
6 Mar 164578.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
2 Oct 164578.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cennini de’ Salamandri:
Francesco Cardinal Cennini de’ Salamandri (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015