Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Cardinal Lancellotti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1571BornRoma, Italy
17 Aug 161139.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 161139.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro
161644.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
9 Dec 162049.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Orazio Lancellotti:
Cardinal Orazio Lancellotti (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a cardinal for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013