Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Ciriaci

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

President of the Pontifical Commission for the Revision of the Code of Canon Law


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1885BornRoma, Italy
18 Dec 190924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
15 Feb 192842.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
18 Mar 192842.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
18 Mar 192842.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czechoslovakia
9 Jan 193448.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
12 Jan 195367.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Oct 195367.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
20 Mar 195468.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
31 May 195569.4AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Authentic Interpretation of the Code of Canon Law
26 Sep 196478.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
30 Dec 196681.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ciriaci:
Pietro Cardinal Ciriaci (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 14
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014