Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Macchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1770Born
20 Sep 179424.0Ordained PriestPriest
1808²37.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
1816²45.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
8 Aug 181847.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
2 Oct 181848.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
4 Oct 181848.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
22 Nov 181949.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
2 Oct 182656.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 182656.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
25 Jun 182756.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
11 Dec 183464.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
14 Dec 184070.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
15 Sep 184171.0AppointedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
22 Jan 184473.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
25 Apr 184473.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
11 Jun 184776.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
30 Sep 186090.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Macchi (VIAF: 33302617)
Vincenzo Cardinal Macchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapo de Monte, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 73
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1826
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 125, and Page 126, and Page 211
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast