Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Charles Cardinal Borromeo

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1538Born
31 Jan 156021.3Elevated to Cardinal
7 Feb 156021.3AppointedAdministrator of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Feb 156021.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
4 Sep 156021.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
21 Dec 156022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 156324.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
4 Sep 156324.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 156325.1Ordained BishopAdministrator of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1564²25.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent
12 May 156425.6AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Oct 1564³25.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
17 Nov 156426.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
Sep 1565³26.9ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent
7 Nov 156527.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
157233.2ResignedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
12 Dec 157234.1ResignedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
3 Nov 158446.0DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1 Nov 1610Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Charles Borromeo (VIAF: 69005084)
St. Charles Cardinal Borromeo (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth Placestanza dei Tre Laghi, Arona, Diocese of Novara
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)piazza S. Maria Podone, Chapel, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 21.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 Jan 1560
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 240
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,091
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1563, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Nov 2017