Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bandino Cardinal Panciatici

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1629BornFlorence, Italy
14 Oct 168960.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Dec 168960.4Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
13 Feb 169060.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169060.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
8 Aug 169162.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
4 Dec 170071.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
19 Feb 171080.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
21 Apr 171888.7DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Bandino Panciatici:
Bandino Cardinal Panciatici (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
  • a cardinal for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015