Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guglielmo Cardinal Pallotta

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1727BornMacerata, Italy
23 Jun 177749.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jul 177749.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
23 Sep 178254.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
1 Jul 178557.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
21 Sep 179567.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Pallotta:
Cardinal Guglielmo Pallotta (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a cardinal for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013