Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Millo

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1695Born
26 Nov 175358.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175358.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
16 Dec 175661.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
16 Nov 175762.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Millo
Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Millo (born , died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast