Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Beniamino Cardinal Cavicchioni

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1836Born
18 Dec 185922.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 188447.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
21 Mar 188447.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
21 Mar 188447.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
21 Mar 188447.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
27 Apr 188447.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida
4 Aug 188952.6AppointedOfficial of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
11 Jan 189457.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
22 Oct 189558.8AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation of the Council
11 Jan 190063.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
22 Jun 190366.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 190366.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
11 Mar 191073.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
17 Apr 191174.3DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Cavicchioni
Beniamino Cardinal Cavicchioni (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeiano, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Maria dell'Assunta, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 14
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 70, and Page 112, and Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast