Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João d’Avila Moreira Lima

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Lesina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1919BornItabirito
8 Apr 194424.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 198262.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
21 Jun 198262.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesina
24 Aug 198263.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesina
20 Mar 200282.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Sep 201192.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João d’Avila Moreira Lima:
Bishop João d’Avila Moreira Lima (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Oct 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013