Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Nossa Senhora do Desterro Malheiro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1694BornViana de Lima, Portugal
25 Jan 171116.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Aug 171824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Jul 173844.1SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
3 Sep 173844.2ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
25 Jan 173944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1 Sep 174551.2SelectedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Dec 174551.5ConfirmedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
5 Dec 177379.4DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Nossa Senhora do Desterro Malheiro:
Bishop Antônio de Nossa Senhora do Desterro Malheiro O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,023
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179, and Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015