Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rosalvo Costa Rêgo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1891Born
28 Oct 191423.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 194654.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Mar 194654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
9 Jun 194654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
3 Mar 195260.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
3 Feb 195462.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rosalvo Costa Rêgo
Archbishop Rosalvo Costa Rêgo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePilar

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast