Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Barros Alarcão

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1634BornLeiria, Portugal
3 Dec 167945.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 168045.7AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
16 Mar 168146.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
6 Apr 170065.4DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Barros Alarcão:
Bishop José de Barros Alarcão (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 20.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013