Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cândido Rubens Padín, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bauru, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1915BornSão Carlos
12 Mar 194327.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Sep 194631.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jun 196246.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
25 Jun 196246.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
5 Aug 196246.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
3 Jan 196650.3AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Apr 197054.6AppointedBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Sep 199075.0RetiredBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jan 200892.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cândido Rubens Padín:
Bishop Cândido Rubens Padín O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bauru

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013