Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Fernando Santiago Esberard (Esberrard)

Deceased

Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1843BornBarcelona, Spain
8 Aug 186925.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 186925.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 189046.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Olinda, Brazil
26 Jun 189046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
28 Sep 189047.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
12 May 189147.6SucceededBishop of Olinda, Brazil
12 Sep 189349.9AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Jan 189753.3DiedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Fernando Santiago Esberard (Esberrard):
Archbishop João Fernando Santiago Esberard (Esberrard) (born , died ) Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 284, and Page 424
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013