Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alberto Lopes de Castro Pinto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1914BornItaqui
16 Apr 193823.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 196449.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
25 Feb 196449.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
1 May 196449.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
16 Jan 197661.4AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Sep 198975.1ResignedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Mar 199782.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Alberto Lopes de Castro Pinto:
Bishop José Alberto Lopes de Castro Pinto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013