Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo da Madre de Deus Seixas da Fonseca Borges, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1690³BornRio de Janeiro
16 Jul 171323.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Aug 171626.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Aug 171626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Sep 173343.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
4 Oct 173343.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
5 Mar 176877.8DiedTitular Bishop of Areopolis

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo da Madre de Deus Seixas da Fonseca Borges:
Bishop Joćo da Madre de Deus Seixas da Fonseca Borges O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Areopolis

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015