Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dimas Lara Barbosa

Archbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1956 BornBoa Esperança
3 Dec 198832.7Ordained PriestPriest of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jun 200347.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jun 200347.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
2 Aug 200347.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
4 May 201155.1AppointedArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
10 Jul 201155.3InstalledArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Dimas Lara Barbosa:
Archbishop Dimas Lara Barbosa (born ) Archbishop of Campo Grande

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campo Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • i: CB, 26 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013