Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloísio Jorge Pena Vitral

Bishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1955 Born
18 Jan 198630.7Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Feb 200650.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Feb 200650.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
25 Mar 200650.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
25 Nov 200954.5AppointedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Sep 201762.4AppointedBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Dec 201762.6InstalledBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Jorge Pena Vitral
Bishop Aloísio Jorge Pena Vitral (born ) Bishop of Sete Lagoas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopGinásio de Mineirinho, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sete Lagoas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,096
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast