Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juarez Delorto Secco

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1970 Born
12 Nov 200030.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
10 Mar 200130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
7 Jun 201746.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Jun 201746.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia
9 Sep 201747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Juarez Delorto Secco
Father Juarez Delorto Secco (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCachoeiro do Itapemirim, Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo
Ordained DeaconSão Geraldo Magela, Church, Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo
Ordained PriestSão Felipe, Church, Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo
Ordained BishopCachoeiro do Itapemirim, Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2017
  • od/c01/ob: CB, 7 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017