Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edson de Castro Homem

Bishop of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1949 Born
18 Oct 197728.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
16 Feb 200555.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
16 Feb 200555.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
12 Mar 200555.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia
6 May 201566.0AppointedBishop of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edson de Castro Homem
Bishop Edson de Castro Homem (born ) Bishop of Iguatú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iguatú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,835
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast