Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edney Gouvêa Mattoso

Bishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1957 BornRio de Janeiro
29 Aug 198730.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Jan 200547.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Jan 200547.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
12 Mar 200548.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
20 Jan 201053.0AppointedBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edney Gouvêa Mattoso:
Bishop Edney Gouvêa Mattoso (born ) Bishop of Nova Friburgo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nova Friburgo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,834
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013