Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Francisco Benassi

Deceased

Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1868Born
23 May 189122.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 190839.3AppointedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
10 May 190839.4Ordained BishopBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
26 Jan 192758.1DiedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Francisco Benassi
Bishop Agostinho Francisco Benassi (born , died ) Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018